PA HB2450 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 7, 1961 (P.L.518, No.268), known as the Delaware River Basin Compact, in organization and area, further providing for voting power.
Title
Amending the act of July 7, 1961 (P.L.518, No.268), known as the Delaware River Basin Compact, in organization and area, further providing for voting power.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2450 PN 2871, FP (Y: 116 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2450 PN 2871, FP (Y: 116 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2022-04-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-04-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (116-84) |
2022-04-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-03-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-03-30 | House | Second consideration |
2022-03-29 | House | Removed from table |
2022-03-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-03-29 | House | First consideration |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |