PA HB245 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Enrolled on October 27 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-04 - Veto No. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 27 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-04 - Veto No. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 31, 1965 (P.L.1257, No.511), known as The Local Tax Enabling Act, in local taxes, further providing for definitions, for payroll tax, for payment of tax to other political subdivisions or states as credit or deduction and withholding tax, for tax limitations and for limitations on assessment; in optional occupational tax elimination, further providing for income tax rate limits; in consolidated collection of local income taxes, further providing for definitions, for declaration and payment of income taxes, for tax collection committees, for powers and duties of Department of Community and Economic Development, for powers and duties of tax officer and for withholding and remittance; and, in collection of delinquent taxes, further providing for penalties and for costs of collection of delinquent per capita, occupation, occupational privilege, emergency and municipal services, local services and income taxes.
Title
In local taxes, further providing for definitions, for payroll tax, for payment of tax to other political subdivisions or states as credit or deduction and withholding tax, for tax limitations and for limitations on assessment; in optional occupational tax elimination, further providing for income tax rate limits; in consolidated collection of local income taxes, further providing for definitions, for declaration and payment of income taxes, for tax collection committees, for powers and duties of Department of Community and Economic Development, for powers and duties of tax officer and for withholding and remittance; and, in collection of delinquent taxes, further providing for penalties and for costs of collection of delinquent per capita, occupation, occupational privilege, emergency and municipal services, local services and income taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 245 PN 4110, CONCUR (Y: 148 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 245 PN 4110, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 245 PN 3951, A10828, GORDNER AMENDMENT NO. A-10828 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 245 PN 3951, A10652, BROWNE AMENDMENT NO. A-10652 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Floor: HB 245 PN 3167, FP (Y: 169 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended A06566 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A06566 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 245 PN 4110, CONCUR (Y: 148 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 245 PN 4110, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 245 PN 3951, A10828, GORDNER AMENDMENT NO. A-10828 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 245 PN 3951, A10652, BROWNE AMENDMENT NO. A-10652 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Floor: HB 245 PN 3167, FP (Y: 169 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended A06566 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A06566 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | House | Veto No. 7 |
2016-11-04 | House | Vetoed by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | House | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (148-42) |
2016-10-26 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-25 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-10-25 | House | In the House |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (36-12) |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments (48-0) |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-09-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2016-05-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-05-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (169-31) |
2016-05-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-05-02 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-05-02 | House | Second consideration |
2016-04-13 | House | Removed from table |
2016-04-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-04-12 | House | First consideration |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to FINANCE |