PA HB245 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-02 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-02 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1990 (P.L.1234, No.204), known as the Family Caregiver Support Act, further providing for intent, for definitions, for caregiver support program, for reimbursements and for entitlement.
Title
Further providing for intent, for definitions, for caregiver support program, for reimbursements and for entitlement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-30 - House - HB 245 PN 255, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-02 | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH | |
2009-03-30 | In the Senate | |
2009-03-30 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-03-25 | Second consideration | |
2009-03-25 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-03-25 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-24 | Removed from table | |
2009-03-23 | Laid on the table | |
2009-03-23 | First consideration | |
2009-03-23 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |