PA HB2449 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of January 10, 1968 (1967 P.L.925, No.417), referred to as the Legislative Officers and Employes Law, providing for electronic posting of expenses.
Title
Providing for electronic posting of expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2449 PN 3047, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2449 PN 2864, 2021 A4105 (Y: 168 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2449 PN 2864, 2021 A4105 (Y: 168 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2022-04-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2022-04-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-26 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-03-30 | House | Removed from table |
2022-03-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-03-29 | House | First consideration |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |