PA HB2445 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-17 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-17 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for administration of oaths.
Title
Further providing for administration of oaths.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-15 - House - HB 2445 PN 3609, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 197 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2010-06-15 | In the Senate | |
2010-06-15 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-14 | Second consideration | |
2010-06-14 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-05-05 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-05-05 | Removed from table | |
2010-05-04 | Laid on the table | |
2010-05-04 | First consideration | |
2010-05-04 | Reported as committed | |
2010-04-22 | Referred to JUDICIARY |