PA HB2412 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 49-11)
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Veto No. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for emergency COVID-19 provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for emergency COVID-19 provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House Floor: HB 2412 PN 3720, CONCUR (Y: 134 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2412 PN 3720, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2412 PN 3720, A5591, COSTA AMENDMENT NO. A-5591 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2412 PN 3720, A5586, FONTANA AMENDMENT NO. A-5586 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2412 PN 3720, A5583, SCHWANK AMENDMENT NO. A-5583 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Floor: HB 2412 PN 3643, FP (Y: 125 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2412 PN 3570, 2019 A5294, SUSP RULES, POLINCHOCK (Y: 125 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2412 PN 3570, 2019 A5201, SCHEMEL (Y: 122 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2412 PN 3570, 2019 A5201, GERMANE, BRADFORD (Y: 109 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2412 PN 3570, 2019 A5212, GERMANE, CUTLER (Y: 93 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2412 PN 3570, 2019 A5199, GERMANE, CUTLER (Y: 93 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2412 PN 3570, 2019 A5138, CIRESI (Y: 186 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-19HouseVeto No. 6
2020-05-19HouseVetoed by the Governor
2020-05-18HousePresented to the Governor
2020-05-18HouseSigned in Senate
2020-05-14HouseSigned in House
2020-05-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (134-68)
2020-05-14HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-05-14HouseReferred to RULES
2020-05-13HouseIn the House
2020-05-13SenateThird consideration and final passage (33-15)
2020-05-13SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-05-12SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-05-12SenateSecond consideration
2020-05-11SenateFirst consideration
2020-05-11SenateReported as amended
2020-05-06SenateReferred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
2020-04-28SenateIn the Senate
2020-04-28HouseThird consideration and final passage (125-77)
2020-04-28HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-04-27HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-04-27HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-04-21HouseRemoved from table
2020-04-20HouseLaid on the table
2020-04-20HouseFirst consideration
2020-04-20HouseReported as committed
2020-04-16HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2412
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2412&pn=3570
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2412&pn=3643
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2412&pn=3720
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=04/20/2020&RollCallId=1781
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1193
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1194
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1195
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1196
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1197
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1198
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1219
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/28/2020&RollCallId=1899
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=31&theDate=05/11/2020&RollCallId=848
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=05/13/2020&RollCallId=868
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=466
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=467
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=468
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=469
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1262
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=05/14/2020&RollCallId=1955

Bill Comments

feedback