PA HB2411 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-10 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-10 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for annual report on flooding and stream restoration in this Commonwealth.
Title
Providing for annual report on flooding and stream restoration in this Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2411 PN 3000, FP (Y: 117 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2411 PN 3000, FP (Y: 117 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2022-06-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (117-81) |
2022-06-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-07 | House | Second consideration |
2022-05-25 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-04-18 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |