PA HB2409 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-10 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-10 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 26, 1978 (P.L.1375, No.325), known as the Dam Safety and Encroachments Act, further providing for definitions; and providing for permit not required for certain maintenance projects.
Title
Further providing for definitions; and providing for permit not required for certain maintenance projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2409 PN 2961, FP (Y: 131 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2409 PN 2961, FP (Y: 131 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2022-06-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (131-67) |
2022-06-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-07 | House | Second consideration |
2022-05-25 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-04-11 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |