PA HB239 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act No. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the Rare Disease Advisory Council and providing for its powers and duties; and providing for duties of the Department of Health, the Insurance Department, the Department of Human Services and the Department of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Rare Disease Advisory Council and providing for its powers and duties; and providing for duties of the Department of Health, the Insurance Department, the Department of Human Services and the Department of Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 239 PN 2005, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 239 PN 2005, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Floor: HB 239 PN 261, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-07HouseAct No. 14
2017-07-07HouseApproved by the Governor
2017-06-30HousePresented to the Governor
2017-06-29HouseSigned in Senate
2017-06-29HouseSigned in House
2017-06-29HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (199-0)
2017-06-29HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2017-06-29HouseReferred to RULES
2017-06-28HouseIn the House
2017-06-28SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2017-06-26SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-06-21SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-21SenateSecond consideration
2017-06-13SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-13SenateReported as amended
2017-05-15SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2017-05-10SenateIn the Senate
2017-05-10HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2017-05-10HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-05-09HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-05-09HouseSecond consideration
2017-05-08HouseRemoved from table
2017-04-04HouseLaid on the table
2017-04-04HouseFirst consideration
2017-04-04HouseReported as committed
2017-02-01HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=239
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0239&pn=0261
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0239&pn=2005
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=04/04/2017&RollCallId=182
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=404
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=343
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=259
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/26/2017&RollCallId=345
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=192
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=601
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/29/2017&RollCallId=810

Bill Comments

feedback