PA HB2328 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-19 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-19 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in charter schools, further providing for transportation.
Title
In charter schools, further providing for transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-04-19 | Removed from table | |
2010-03-24 | Laid on the table | |
2010-03-24 | First consideration | |
2010-03-24 | Reported as committed | |
2010-03-12 | Referred to EDUCATION |