PA HB2326 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 23, 1967 (P.L.251, No.102), known as the Economic Development Financing Law, further providing for competition in award of contracts.
Title
Further providing for competition in award of contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Keller [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - House - HB 2326 PN 3401, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2012-05-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-05-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2012-05-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-05-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-05-22 | House | Second consideration |
2012-05-21 | House | Removed from table |
2012-05-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-05-08 | House | First consideration |
2012-05-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2012-04-25 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |