PA HB2326 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 4 2008 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 20A
Status: Enrolled on July 4 2008 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 20A
Summary
An Act making appropriations to the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania.
Title
An Act making appropriations to the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-07-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2008-07-04 | Presented to the Governor | |
2008-07-03 | Signed in Senate | |
2008-07-03 | Signed in House | |
2008-07-03 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2008-07-03 | Reported as committed | |
2008-07-03 | Referred to RULES | |
2008-07-03 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-07-02 | Re-reported as amended | |
2008-07-01 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-07-01 | Second consideration | |
2008-06-30 | First consideration | |
2008-06-30 | Reported as committed | |
2008-06-30 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-06-30 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-06-30 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-06-04 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-06-04 | Second consideration | |
2008-06-02 | Re-reported as amended | |
2008-03-31 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-03-31 | Removed from table | |
2008-03-17 | Laid on the table | |
2008-03-17 | First consideration | |
2008-03-17 | Reported as committed | |
2008-03-10 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2326 |