PA HB2293 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-24 - Act No. 167
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-24 - Act No. 167
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 30 (Fish) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for classification of offenses and penalties and for revocation, suspension or denial of license, permit or registration; providing for serious unlawful take and for taking or possessing by illegal methods; and further providing for Lake Erie fishing permits.
Title
Further providing for classification of offenses and penalties and for revocation, suspension or denial of license, permit or registration; providing for serious unlawful take and for taking or possessing by illegal methods; and further providing for Lake Erie fishing permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-15 - House - HB 2293 PN 4150, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-03 - Senate - HB 2293 PN 4150, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-01 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-05 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - HB 2293 PN 3327, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-10-03 - Senate - HB 2293 PN 4150, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-01 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-05 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - HB 2293 PN 3327, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-24 | House | Act No. 167 |
2012-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2012-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2012-10-16 | House | Signed in Senate |
2012-10-15 | House | Signed in House |
2012-10-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (194-0) |
2012-10-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-10-03 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-10-03 | House | In the House |
2012-10-03 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2012-10-02 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-10-01 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-06-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2012-05-29 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2012-05-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-05-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2012-05-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-05-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-05-09 | House | Second consideration |
2012-05-08 | House | Removed from table |
2012-05-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-05-07 | House | First consideration |
2012-05-07 | House | Reported as committed |
2012-04-02 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |