PA HB229 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in fees, providing for recreational trailers and for special procedures for trailer registration; and, in size, weight and load, further providing for registered gross weight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions, further providing for definitions; in fees, providing for recreational trailers and for special procedures for trailer registration; and, in size, weight and load, further providing for registered gross weight.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 229 PN 196, FP (Y: 191 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-06-28SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-28HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-7)
2017-06-28HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-27HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-27HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-14HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-14HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-14HouseReported as committed
2017-01-31HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=229
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0229&pn=0196
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=634
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/27/2017&RollCallId=763
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=574
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/28/2017&RollCallId=783

Bill Comments

feedback