PA HB229 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-14)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act No. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-14)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act No. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of harassment.
Title
In assault, further providing for the offense of harassment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 229 PN 486, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Floor: HB 229 PN 486, FP (Y: 193 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Floor: HB 229 PN 310, 2015 A94, PETRARCA (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Floor: HB 229 PN 310, 2015 A104, KRIEGER (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00052 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00052 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Floor: HB 229 PN 486, FP (Y: 193 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Floor: HB 229 PN 310, 2015 A94, PETRARCA (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Floor: HB 229 PN 310, 2015 A104, KRIEGER (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00052 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00052 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Act No. 26 |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Signed in House |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-02-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-5) |
2015-02-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-02-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-02-10 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-02-04 | House | Removed from table |
2015-02-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-02-03 | House | First consideration |
2015-02-03 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |