PA HB2285 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Act No. 7A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Act No. 7A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from the restricted revenue accounts within the State Gaming Fund and from the State Gaming Fund to the Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, the Department of Revenue, the Pennsylvania State Police and the Attorney General for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2010, to June 30, 2011, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2010.
Title
Making appropriations from the restricted revenue accounts within the State Gaming Fund and from the State Gaming Fund to the Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, the Department of Revenue, the Pennsylvania State Police and the Attorney General for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2010, to June 30, 2011, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2010.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Senate - HB 2285 PN 4033, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - House - HB 2285 PN 3274, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 149 N: 40 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - House - HB 2285 PN 3274, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 149 N: 40 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Act No. 7A | |
2010-07-06 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-06-30 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-06-30 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-06-30 | Signed in House | |
2010-06-30 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2010-06-30 | Reported as committed | |
2010-06-30 | Referred to RULES | |
2010-06-30 | In the House | |
2010-06-30 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-30 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-06-15 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-06-15 | Second consideration | |
2010-06-14 | First consideration | |
2010-06-14 | Reported as committed | |
2010-03-19 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-03-15 | In the Senate | |
2010-03-15 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-03-10 | Second consideration | |
2010-03-08 | Removed from table | |
2010-03-08 | Laid on the table | |
2010-03-08 | First consideration | |
2010-03-08 | Reported as committed | |
2010-03-05 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |