PA HB2242 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-20 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-20 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act providing for the highway capital budget project itemization for flood-damaged highways to be financed from revenue from the Motor License Fund.
Title
Providing for the highway capital budget project itemization for flood-damaged highways to be financed from revenue from the Motor License Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - HB 2242 PN 3300, FP (Y: 193 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-20 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-04-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-04-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-1) |
2012-04-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-04-02 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-04-02 | House | Second consideration |
2012-03-29 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2012-03-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-03-27 | House | Removed from table |
2012-03-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-03-26 | House | First consideration |
2012-03-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2012-03-12 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |