PA HB2242 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-05-21 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-05-21 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Summary
An Act requiring public notices relating to long-term care providers; and providing for compliance and enforcement, for certain information to be posted on the Internet, for certain information to be provided directly to consumers and consumers' designated persons and for certain duties of Commonwealth agencies responsible for licensure, certification and other approval of long-term care providers.
Title
An Act requiring public notices relating to long-term care providers; and providing for compliance and enforcement, for certain information to be posted on the Internet, for certain information to be provided directly to consumers and consumers' designated persons and for certain duties of Commonwealth agencies responsible for licensure, certification and other approval of long-term care providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-05-21 | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH | |
2008-05-12 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-05-07 | Second consideration | |
2008-05-05 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-03-11 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-03-11 | Removed from table | |
2008-03-10 | Laid on the table | |
2008-03-10 | First consideration | |
2008-03-10 | Reported as committed | |
2008-02-11 | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2242 |