PA HB2241 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-4)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in other subjects of taxation, providing for prohibited fees, surcharges and taxes; and making inconsistent repeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In other subjects of taxation, providing for prohibited fees, surcharges and taxes; and making inconsistent repeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House Commerce: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Commerce: To Table (Y: 9 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House Commerce: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 10 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A06855 (Y: 10 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A06511 (Y: 10 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A06490 (Y: 8 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-25HouseLaid on the table
2018-05-02HouseRemoved from table
2018-05-01HouseLaid on the table
2018-05-01HouseFirst consideration
2018-05-01HouseReported as committed
2018-04-09HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2241
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2241&pn=3290
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1504
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1505
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1506
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1507
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1508
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1510

Bill Comments

feedback