PA HB2233 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Act No. 46 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Act No. 46 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in miscellaneous provisions relating to operation of vehicles, further providing for accident scene clearance.
Title
In miscellaneous provisions relating to operation of vehicles, further providing for accident scene clearance.
Sponsors
Rep. Gina Curry [D] | Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D] | Rep. Jose Giral [D] | Rep. Anthony Bellmon [D] |
Rep. Ben Sanchez [D] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Mary Jo Daley [D] | Rep. Roni Green [D] |
Rep. Steven Malagari [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-07-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2233 PN 3164, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2233 PN 3164, Motion to agree to the bill on second consideration (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - House - House Floor: HB 2233 PN 3164, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 198 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2233 PN 3052, 2023 A4519 (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04311 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2233 PN 3164, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2233 PN 3164, Motion to agree to the bill on second consideration (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - House - House Floor: HB 2233 PN 3164, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 198 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2233 PN 3052, 2023 A4519 (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04311 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-08 | Senate | Act No. 46 of 2024 |
2024-07-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Signed in House |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Second consideration, *opening vote* June 26, 2024 (49-0) |
2024-06-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2024-06-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-06-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-4) |
2024-06-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-05-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-05-22 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2024-05-21 | House | Removed from table |
2024-05-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-05-06 | House | First consideration |
2024-05-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2024-04-24 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |