PA HB2214 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 127 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 127 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 67 (Public Welfare) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in miscellaneous provisions, providing for miscellaneous provisions; and making an editorial change.
Title
In miscellaneous provisions, providing for miscellaneous provisions; and making an editorial change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2214 PN 3065, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2214 PN 3065, FP (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2214 PN 2955, 2021 A4129 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A03708 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2214 PN 3065, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2214 PN 3065, FP (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2214 PN 2955, 2021 A4129 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A03708 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | Senate | Act No. 127 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-05-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) |
2022-05-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-27 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-04-26 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-11 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |