PA HB2206 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-02 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-02 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 18, 2001 (P.L.949, No.114), known as the Workforce Development Act, in local workforce investment areas and boards, further providing for membership.
Title
In local workforce investment areas and boards, further providing for membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2206 PN 3331, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2206 PN 3331, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-02 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2018-04-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2018-04-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-18 | House | Second consideration |
2018-04-17 | House | Removed from table |
2018-04-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-16 | House | First consideration |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |