PA HB2188 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-27 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-27 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in community-based services tax credit, further providing for definitions and for amount of tax credits; and providing for tax credit hiatus.
Title
In community-based services tax credit, further providing for definitions and for amount of tax credits; and providing for tax credit hiatus.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-27 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2014-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-24 | House | Final passage (104-97) |
2014-06-24 | House | Vote by which this bill was defeated on final passage, reconsidered (111-91) |
2014-06-24 | House | Third consideration and defeated on final passage (101-100) |
2014-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-23 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-03 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-03 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred to FINANCE |