PA HB2185 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-01 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-01 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in general budget implementation, further providing for the Department of Aging.
Title
In general budget implementation, further providing for the Department of Aging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-07-01 | House | Second consideration |
2016-07-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-29 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-29 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-06-21 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |