PA HB2177 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Act No. 9A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Act No. 9A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making an appropriation from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund to the Office of Consumer Advocate in the Office of Attorney General.
Title
Making an appropriation from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund to the Office of Consumer Advocate in the Office of Attorney General.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2177 PN 3552, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 2177 PN 3552, FP (Y: 188 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 2177 PN 3552, FP (Y: 188 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-08 | Senate | Act No. 9A |
2016-07-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-06-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-4) |
2016-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-22 | House | Second consideration |
2016-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-20 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-20 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-06-20 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |