PA HB217 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Act No. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Act No. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in offenses against the family, further providing for the offense of endangering welfare of children.
Title
In offenses against the family, further providing for the offense of endangering welfare of children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 217 PN 1502, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Floor: HB 217 PN 1502, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Floor: HB 217 PN 181, 2017 A720, PETRARCA (Y: 148 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Floor: HB 217 PN 1502, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Floor: HB 217 PN 181, 2017 A720, PETRARCA (Y: 148 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Act No. 12 |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Signed in House |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-04-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2017-04-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-19 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-04-05 | House | Removed from table |
2017-04-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-04-04 | House | First consideration |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |