PA HB2157 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-12)
Status: Vetoed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Veto No. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, further providing for Commission for Agricultural Education Excellence; in vocational education, providing for utilization of credits; and providing for classification of program code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In terms and courses of study, further providing for Commission for Agricultural Education Excellence; in vocational education, providing for utilization of credits; and providing for classification of program code.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2157 PN 3278, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2157 PN 3278, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-24SenateVeto No. 4
2018-10-24SenateVetoed by the Governor
2018-10-18SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-17SenateSigned in House
2018-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (46-3)
2018-10-16SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-10-15SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-15SenateSecond consideration
2018-09-25SenateFirst consideration
2018-09-25SenateReported as committed
2018-05-18SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2018-04-30SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-30HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2018-04-30HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-18HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-18HouseSecond consideration
2018-04-17HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-16HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-16HouseFirst consideration
2018-04-16HouseReported as committed
2018-04-06HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2157
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2157&pn=3278
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=04/16/2018&RollCallId=1421
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1147
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/30/2018&RollCallId=1482
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=09/25/2018&RollCallId=1120
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/16/2018&RollCallId=1225
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=746

Bill Comments

feedback