PA HB2141 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions relating to home rule and optional plan government, further providing for definitions, providing for appointment of government study commission in distressed municipality and further providing for first meeting of commission, for function and duty of commission, for hearings and public forums, for report of findings and recommendations, for limitation on enactment of ordinance or filing of petition and for limitation on municipal powers.
Title
In general provisions relating to home rule and optional plan government, further providing for definitions, providing for appointment of government study commission in distressed municipality and further providing for first meeting of commission, for function and duty of commission, for hearings and public forums, for report of findings and recommendations, for limitation on enactment of ordinance or filing of petition and for limitation on municipal powers.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Garth Everett [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] |
Rep. Christina Sappey [D] | Rep. William Kortz [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2141 PN 3048, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2141 PN 3048, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-10 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-07-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-07-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-07-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-07-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-07-08 | House | Second consideration |
2020-07-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-23 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2020-06-23 | House | First consideration |
2020-06-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-12-17 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |