PA HB2141 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-24 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-24 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 64 (Public Authorities and Quasi-Public Corporations) and 72 (Taxation and Fiscal Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Title 64, providing for community development authorities; and, in Title 72, providing for microenterprise assistance.
Title
In Title 64, providing for community development authorities; and, in Title 72, providing for microenterprise assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-24 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-27 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-05-07 | House | Removed from table |
2014-05-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-05-06 | House | First consideration |
2014-05-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |