PA HB2141 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 62 (Procurement) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in small and disadvantaged businesses, further defining "small business"; and providing for authority to waive employee limit.
Title
In small and disadvantaged businesses, further defining "small business"; and providing for authority to waive employee limit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-14 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-14 | Removed from table | |
2010-09-13 | Laid on the table | |
2010-09-13 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-06-29 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2010-06-29 | First consideration | |
2010-06-29 | Reported as amended | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |