PA HB2122 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 8 (Boroughs and Incorporated Towns) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in associations and organizations, further providing for associations and organizations for mayors; in elections of officers, further providing for eligibility; in powers, duties and rights of appointed officers and employees, further providing for appointments and incompatible offices and for police serving under cooperative agreement or contract; in corporate powers, further providing for specific powers; in taxation and finance, further providing for investment of funds; providing for solid waste collection and disposition; and, in ordinances, further providing for ordinances and resolutions and for publication.
Title
In associations and organizations, further providing for associations and organizations for mayors; in elections of officers, further providing for eligibility; in powers, duties and rights of appointed officers and employees, further providing for appointments and incompatible offices and for police serving under cooperative agreement or contract; in corporate powers, further providing for specific powers; in taxation and finance, further providing for investment of funds; providing for solid waste collection and disposition; and, in ordinances, further providing for ordinances and resolutions and for publication.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Garth Everett [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] |
Rep. Christina Sappey [D] | Rep. William Kortz [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2122 PN 4080, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2122 PN 3012, 2019 A6533, B. MILLER (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2122 PN 4080, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2122 PN 3012, 2019 A6533, B. MILLER (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-10 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-07-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-07-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-07-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-07-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-07-08 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-07-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-23 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2020-06-23 | House | First consideration |
2020-06-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-12-10 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |