PA HB2117 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-10)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 31586, on that portion of State Route 2004 carrying Broadway Street over the Casselman River, in Summit Township, Somerset County, as the Airman Michael L. Menser Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 31586, on that portion of State Route 2004 carrying Broadway Street over the Casselman River, in Summit Township, Somerset County, as the Airman Michael L. Menser Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2117 PN 3002, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2117 PN 3002, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-01-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2020-01-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-15 | House | Second consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-16 | House | First consideration |
2019-12-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-12-09 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |