PA HB2082 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in certification of teachers, further providing for program of continuing professional education.
Title
In certification of teachers, further providing for program of continuing professional education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2082 PN 3392, FP (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2082 PN 3392, FP (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2016-06-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (186-0) |
2016-06-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-06 | House | Second consideration |
2016-05-25 | House | Removed from table |
2016-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-23 | House | First consideration |
2016-05-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-05-19 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |