PA HB2079 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-16 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-16 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, further providing for applicability to certain buildings.
Title
Further providing for applicability to certain buildings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2014-05-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-05-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2014-05-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-05-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-05-05 | House | Second consideration |
2014-04-30 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-29 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |