PA HB207 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-21)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-04 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on February 5 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-04 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, providing for professional and trade association rate protection.
Title
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, providing for professional and trade association rate protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-06-04 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-04 | Second consideration | |
2007-05-24 | Removed from table | |
2007-05-22 | Laid on the table | |
2007-05-22 | First consideration | |
2007-05-22 | Reported as amended | |
2007-02-05 | Referred to INSURANCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=207 |