PA HB2050 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 84-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-02 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in abortion, further providing for definitions and for medical consultation and judgment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In abortion, further providing for definitions and for medical consultation and judgment.

Sponsors

Rep. Michael Turzai [R]Sen. Judith Ward [R]Rep. Matthew Dowling [R]Rep. Kathy Rapp [R]
Rep. Harry Readshaw [D]Rep. Bryan Barbin [D]Rep. Matthew Baker [R]Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R]
Rep. Stephen Bloom [R]Rep. Karen Boback [R]Rep. Frank Burns [D]Rep. Martin Causer [R]
Rep. Jim Cox [R]Rep. Bryan Cutler [R]Rep. Russ Diamond [R]Rep. Cris Dush [R]
Rep. Brian Ellis [R]Rep. Eli Evankovich [R]Rep. Garth Everett [R]Rep. Melinda Fee [R]
Rep. Jonathan Fritz [R]Rep. Mark Gillen [R]Rep. Keith Gillespie [R]Rep. Keith Greiner [R]
Rep. Seth Grove [R]Rep. Doyle Heffley [R]Rep. Susan Helm [R]Rep. Timothy Hennessey [R]
Rep. David Hickernell [R]Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R]Rep. Rich Irvin [R]Rep. Robert Kauffman [R]
Rep. Sid Kavulich [D]Rep. Frederick Keller [R]Rep. Kate Klunk [R]Rep. Jerome Knowles [R]
Rep. Anita Kulik [D]Rep. John Lawrence [R]Rep. David Maloney [R]Rep. James Marshall [R]
Rep. Ron Marsico [R]Rep. John McGinnis [R]Rep. Steven Mentzer [R]Rep. Daryl Metcalfe [R]
Rep. Brett Miller [R]Rep. Thomas Murt [R]Rep. Eric Nelson [R]Rep. Tedd Nesbit [R]
Rep. Donna Oberlander [R]Rep. Jason Ortitay [R]Rep. Tina Pickett [R]Rep. Jeffrey Pyle [R]
Rep. Thomas Quigley [R]Rep. David Reed [R]Rep. Michael Reese [R]Rep. Bradley Roae [R]
Rep. Eric Roe [R]Rep. Greg Rothman [R]Rep. Francis Ryan [R]Rep. Richard Saccone [R]
Rep. Stanley Saylor [R]Rep. Paul Schemel [R]Rep. Craig Staats [R]Rep. Will Tallman [R]
Rep. Jesse Topper [R]Rep. Justin Walsh [R]Rep. Ryan Warner [R]Rep. Katharine Watson [R]
Rep. Parke Wentling [R]Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R]Rep. David Zimmerman [R]Rep. Kerry Benninghoff [R]
Rep. John Maher [R]Rep. William Kortz [D]Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D]Rep. Curtis Sonney [R]
Rep. Thomas Sankey [R]Rep. Carl Metzgar [R]Rep. Jim Christiana [R]Rep. Justin Simmons [R]
Rep. Dawn Keefer [R]Rep. Joseph Emrick [R]Rep. Michael Peifer [R]Rep. Gene DiGirolamo [R]
Rep. Jack Rader [R]Rep. Thomas Mehaffie [R]Rep. Alexander Charlton [R]Rep. Michael Corr [R]
Rep. Harry Lewis [R]Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R]Rep. George Dunbar [R]

Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 2050 PN 3034, FP (Y: 139 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 2050 PN 3034, MOT CONST, FRANKEL (Y: 135 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2050 PN 3034, 2017 A6341, FRANKEL (Y: 63 N: 127 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-02SenateRemoved from table
2018-10-02SenateLaid on the table
2018-06-13SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-13SenateReported as committed
2018-04-30SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2018-04-16SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (139-56)
2018-04-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-11HouseSecond consideration
2018-04-10HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-09HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-09HouseFirst consideration
2018-04-09HouseReported as committed
2018-02-26HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2050
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2050&pn=3034
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=04/09/2018&RollCallId=1355
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1084
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1118
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1119
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/16/2018&RollCallId=1440
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/13/2018&RollCallId=944

Bill Comments

feedback