PA HB2044 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-12)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the bridge on State Route 641, also known as East High Street, over the Letort Spring in Carlisle Borough, Cumberland County, as the Lance Corporal Edward Rykoskey Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating the bridge on State Route 641, also known as East High Street, over the Letort Spring in Carlisle Borough, Cumberland County, as the Lance Corporal Edward Rykoskey Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2044 PN 2951, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2044 PN 2951, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2018-05-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-05-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2018-05-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-05-02 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-05-02 | House | Second consideration |
2018-05-01 | House | Removed from table |
2018-04-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-30 | House | First consideration |
2018-04-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |