PA HB2041 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act providing for standards for towing and for violations.
Title
Providing for standards for towing and for violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-17 - House - HB 2041 PN 3191, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 139 N: 52 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - House - HB 2041 PN 3191, 2009 A5855, BARRAR (Y: 69 N: 127 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-16 - House - HB 2041 PN 3191, 2009 A5855, BARRAR (Y: 69 N: 127 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-14 | Laid on the table | |
2010-09-21 | First consideration | |
2010-09-21 | Reported as amended | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE | |
2010-03-17 | In the Senate | |
2010-03-17 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-03-16 | Second consideration | |
2010-02-08 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-01-26 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-01-26 | Removed from table | |
2010-01-25 | Laid on the table | |
2010-01-25 | First consideration | |
2010-01-25 | Reported as amended | |
2009-10-16 | Referred to INSURANCE |