PA HB2026 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 51 (Military Affairs) and 74 (Transportation) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Department of Military Affairs, providing for Civil Air Patrol; and, in authority of Department of Transportation, further providing for authority of department.
Title
In Department of Military Affairs, providing for Civil Air Patrol; and, in authority of Department of Transportation, further providing for authority of department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 2026 PN 3253, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 2026 PN 3253, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-10-17 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-07-12 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2016-06-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-06-10 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-0) |
2016-06-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-05-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-05-25 | House | Second consideration |
2016-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2016-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-23 | House | First consideration |
2016-05-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-04-29 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |