PA HB202 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 74-16-3)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Act No. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, further providing for Keystone Exams.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for Keystone Exams.

Sponsors

Rep. Michael Turzai [R]Rep. Michael Tobash [R]Rep. Stanley Saylor [R]Rep. Bryan Cutler [R]
Rep. Marcy Toepel [R]Rep. Kurt Masser [R]Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R]Rep. Judith Ward [R]
Rep. Karen Boback [R]Rep. Martin Causer [R]Rep. Robert Kauffman [R]Rep. Matthew Baker [R]
Rep. Michael Schlossberg [D]Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R]Rep. Robert James [R]Rep. Richard Saccone [R]
Rep. David Hickernell [R]Rep. Keith Greiner [R]Rep. Stephen Bloom [R]Rep. Thomas Quigley [R]
Rep. Harold English [R]Rep. Tina Pickett [R]Rep. Mark Keller [R]Rep. Melinda Fee [R]
Rep. Gerald Mullery [D]Rep. David Millard [R]Rep. Jesse Topper [R]Rep. Robert Godshall [R]
Rep. James Marshall [?]Rep. Neal Goodman [D]Rep. Ed Neilson [D]Rep. Craig Staats [R]
Rep. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R]Rep. Harry Readshaw [D]Rep. Seth Grove [R]Rep. Tina Davis [D]
Rep. Kathy Rapp [R]Rep. Dominic Costa [D]Rep. Ryan Warner [R]Rep. Jason Ortitay [R]
Rep. Greg Rothman [R]Rep. Rich Irvin [R]Rep. Francis Ryan [R]Rep. James Roebuck [D]
Rep. Doyle Heffley [R]Rep. John Lawrence [R]Rep. Brett Miller [R]Rep. Justin Simmons [R]
Rep. Rebecca Corbin [R]Rep. Paul Schemel [R]Rep. Alexander Charlton [R]Rep. Aaron Kaufer [R]
Rep. Cris Dush [R]Rep. Harry Lewis [R]Rep. Thomas Sankey [R]Rep. Mark Longietti [?]
Rep. Todd Stephens [R]Rep. Dan Frankel [D]Rep. Susan Helm [R]Rep. David Maloney [R]
Rep. Matthew Gabler [R]Rep. Dawn Keefer [R]Rep. Garth Everett [R]Rep. Marguerite Quinn [R]
Rep. Mike Carroll [D]Rep. John McGinnis [R]Rep. Eric Nelson [R]Rep. Frank Farry [R]
Rep. Warren Kampf [R]Rep. Marcia Hahn [R]Rep. Patrick Harkins [D]Rep. Russ Diamond [R]
Rep. Tarah Toohil [?]Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D]Rep. George Dunbar [R]Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Pyle [R]Rep. Rosemary Brown [R]Rep. Frederick Keller [R]Rep. Robert Freeman [D]
Rep. Lynda Schlegel Culver [R]Rep. Mark Gillen [R]Rep. Jake Wheatley [D]Rep. Matthew Dowling [R]
Rep. William Kortz [D]Rep. Kate Klunk [R]Rep. Kerry Benninghoff [R]Rep. James Santora [R]
Rep. Bryan Barbin [D]Rep. Jim Cox [R]Rep. Nicholas Miccarelli [R]Rep. Donna Oberlander [R]
Rep. Eric Roe [R]

Roll Calls

2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 202 PN 161, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 202 PN 161, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-21SenateAct No. 6
2017-06-21SenateApproved by the Governor
2017-06-12SenatePresented to the Governor
2017-06-12SenateSigned in Senate
2017-06-07SenateSigned in House
2017-06-06SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-06-05SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-04-18SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-04-18SenateSecond consideration
2017-03-29SenateFirst consideration
2017-03-29SenateReported as committed
2017-03-20SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2017-03-13SenateIn the Senate
2017-03-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (187-0)
2017-03-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-02-08HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-02-08HouseSecond consideration
2017-02-07HouseRemoved from table
2017-02-06HouseLaid on the table
2017-02-06HouseFirst consideration
2017-02-06HouseReported as committed
2017-01-24HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=202
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0202&pn=0161
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=02/06/2017&RollCallId=16
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=57
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/13/2017&RollCallId=85
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=03/29/2017&RollCallId=92
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/05/2017&RollCallId=224
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=132

Bill Comments

feedback