PA HB2018 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 54 in West Mahanoy Township, Schuylkill County, as the Francis V. "Angie" McAndrew Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 54 in West Mahanoy Township, Schuylkill County, as the Francis V. "Angie" McAndrew Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2018 PN 2899, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2018 PN 2899, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2018-04-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2018-04-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-09 | House | Second consideration |
2018-03-14 | House | Removed from table |
2018-03-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-03-12 | House | First consideration |
2018-03-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |