PA HB2013 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school directors, further providing for filling of vacancies.
Title
In school directors, further providing for filling of vacancies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | Act No. 74 |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2014-04-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-04-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2014-04-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-04-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-04-07 | House | Second consideration |
2014-04-02 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-01 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-01 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |