PA HB2009 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-07 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-07 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 4 (Amusements) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in gaming, further providing for general and specific powers of the Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, for regulatory authority of Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board and for table game taxes.
Title
In gaming, further providing for general and specific powers of the Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, for regulatory authority of Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board and for table game taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-05 - House - HB 2009 PN 2653, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-10-26 - House - HB 2009 PN 2496, 2011 A5761, BURNS (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-10-26 - House - HB 2009 PN 2496, 2011 A5557, CLYMER (Y: 105 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-10-26 - House - HB 2009 PN 2496, 2011 A5761, BURNS (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-10-26 - House - HB 2009 PN 2496, 2011 A5557, CLYMER (Y: 105 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-07 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2011-12-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-12-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2011-11-14 | House | Removed from table |
2011-10-31 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-10-31 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-10-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-10-26 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2011-10-25 | House | Removed from table |
2011-10-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-10-17 | House | First consideration |
2011-10-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-10-04 | House | Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT |