PA HB1989 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-4)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in dates of elections and primaries and special elections, further providing for special elections for Senator and Representative in the General Assembly.
Title
In dates of elections and primaries and special elections, further providing for special elections for Senator and Representative in the General Assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-14 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-12-14 | Removed from table | |
2009-12-09 | Laid on the table | |
2009-12-09 | First consideration | |
2009-12-09 | Reported as committed | |
2009-09-21 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |