PA HB1983 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 3 (Agriculture) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in race horse industry reform, further providing for costs of enforcement of medication rules or regulations.
Title
In race horse industry reform, further providing for costs of enforcement of medication rules or regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1983 PN 3673, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1983 PN 2788, 2019 A5304, CAUSER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1983 PN 3673, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1983 PN 2788, 2019 A5304, CAUSER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2020-05-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-05-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-29 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-04-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-27 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-25 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |