PA HB1968 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-03 - Act No. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-03 - Act No. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission and the Governor, to grant and convey to the Bradford House Historical Association certain lands situate in the City of Washington, Washington County; and to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a competitive bid process, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in South Strabane Township, Washington County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey to the Salvation Army, or its successors or assigns, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in the Borough of East Stroudsburg, Monroe County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to ACMIII, LP, certain lands of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania situate in Derry Township, Westmoreland County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Pennsylvania State Police and the Governor, to grant and convey to Jefferson County certain lands situate in Young Township, Jefferson County; and authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission and the Governor, to grant and convey to the Southern Lancaster County Historical Society certain lands situate in Fulton Township, Lancaster County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission and the Governor, to grant and convey to the Bradford House Historical Association certain lands situate in the City of Washington, Washington County; and to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a competitive bid process, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in South Strabane Township, Washington County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey to the Salvation Army, or its successors or assigns, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in the Borough of East Stroudsburg, Monroe County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to ACMIII, LP, certain lands of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania situate in Derry Township, Westmoreland County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Pennsylvania State Police and the Governor, to grant and convey to Jefferson County certain lands situate in Young Township, Jefferson County; and authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission and the Governor, to grant and convey to the Southern Lancaster County Historical Society certain lands situate in Fulton Township, Lancaster County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1968 PN 4113, CONCUR (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1968 PN 4113, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1968 PN 3964, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1968 PN 3881, 2015 A10330, RADER (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended A09779 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A09779 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1968 PN 4113, CONCUR (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1968 PN 4113, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1968 PN 3964, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1968 PN 3881, 2015 A10330, RADER (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended A09779 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A09779 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-03 | House | Act No. 140 |
2016-11-03 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | House | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (190-0) |
2016-10-26 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-25 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-10-25 | House | In the House |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-10-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2016-10-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2016-10-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-09-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-09-28 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-09-27 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-21 | House | First consideration |
2016-09-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2016-04-07 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |