PA HB1957 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 994 over the Blacklog Creek, Cromwell Township, Huntingdon County, as the Lieutenant Joseph O. Stevens Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 994 over the Blacklog Creek, Cromwell Township, Huntingdon County, as the Lieutenant Joseph O. Stevens Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1957 PN 2242, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1957 PN 2242, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2022-04-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-04-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-03-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-03-29 | House | Second consideration |
2022-02-08 | House | Removed from table |
2021-12-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-12-14 | House | First consideration |
2021-12-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-10-05 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |