PA HB1952 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-11)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Act No. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses), 23 (Domestic Relations) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sexual offenses, further providing for conduct relating to sex offenders and for general rule; in falsification and intimidation, further providing for the offense of failure to comply with registration requirements, defining the offense of failure to comply with 42 Pa.C.S. Ch. 97 Subch. I registration requirements and imposing penalties; in proceedings prior to petition to adopt, further providing for grounds for involuntary termination, for definitions and for expunction of information of perpetrator who was under 18 years of age when child abuse was committed; in domestic and sexual violence victim address confidentiality, further providing for agency use of designated address; in sentencing, extensively revising registration of sexual offenders provisions; and making editorial changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In sexual offenses, further providing for conduct relating to sex offenders and for general rule; in falsification and intimidation, further providing for the offense of failure to comply with registration requirements, defining the offense of failure to comply with 42 Pa.C.S. Ch. 97 Subch. I registration requirements and imposing penalties; in proceedings prior to petition to adopt, further providing for grounds for involuntary termination, for definitions and for expunction of information of perpetrator who was under 18 years of age when child abuse was committed; in domestic and sexual violence victim address confidentiality, further providing for agency use of designated address; in sentencing, extensively revising registration of sexual offenders provisions; and making editorial changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1952 PN 3543, CONCUR (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1952 PN 3543, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1952 PN 2820, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1952 PN 2770, 2017 A5231, MARSICO (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12HouseAct No. 29
2018-06-12HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-06-04HousePresented to the Governor
2018-06-04HouseSigned in Senate
2018-05-23HouseSigned in House
2018-05-23HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (191-0)
2018-05-23HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-05-23HouseReferred to RULES
2018-05-22HouseIn the House
2018-05-22SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2018-05-21SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-04-25SenateRemoved from table
2018-04-25SenateLaid on the table
2018-03-20SenateSecond consideration
2018-03-19SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-02-05SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-02-05SenateFirst consideration
2018-02-05SenateReported as committed
2018-01-02SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-12-13SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (188-0)
2017-12-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-12HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-12-11HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-05HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-05HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-05HouseReported as committed
2017-12-04HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1952
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1952&pn=2770
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1952&pn=2820
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1952&pn=3543
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/05/2017&RollCallId=1095
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=930
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=1183
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=954
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=02/05/2018&RollCallId=675
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=03/19/2018&RollCallId=690
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=500
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1255
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=05/23/2018&RollCallId=1547

Bill Comments

feedback