PA HB1947 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-20)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Referred to FINANCE
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Referred to FINANCE
Summary
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for exemptions and special provisions.
Title
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for exemptions and special provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-28 | Referred to FINANCE | |
2008-01-17 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-01-16 | Second consideration | |
2008-01-16 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-12-05 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-12-05 | Removed from table | |
2007-10-24 | Laid on the table | |
2007-10-24 | First consideration | |
2007-10-24 | Reported as committed | |
2007-10-23 | Referred to FINANCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1947 |