PA HB1903 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-22 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-22 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for water and sewer projects.
Title
Providing for water and sewer projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1903 PN 2942, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 133 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1903 PN 2755, 2023 A3976 (Y: 99 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1903 PN 2755, 2023 A3960 (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A03660 (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1903 PN 2942, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 133 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1903 PN 2755, 2023 A3976 (Y: 99 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1903 PN 2755, 2023 A3960 (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A03660 (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-04-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (133-67) |
2024-04-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-04-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-04-15 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2024-04-10 | House | Removed from table |
2024-03-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-03-20 | House | First consideration |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-12-11 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |